Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00245
Date Filed2018-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning FISA applications pertaining to the Russian investigation. The FBI denied the request. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal, which was also denied. Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5316143) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-022LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/13/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/13/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Attorney for DC), # 2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Attorney General), # 3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Department of Justice))(Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-03-145NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-156ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Powell, Amy) Modified to add link on 3/16/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-04-02MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/2/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-237Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-188STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-08-039Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-1410VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED 10/9/2018.....MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before October 5, 2018; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition is due on or before November 2, 2018; Defendant's opposition and reply is due on or before November 20, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply is due on or before December 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/14/2018. (lccrc3) Modified on 8/14/2018 (zlsj). Modified on 10/9/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/5/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/2/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/20/2018. Plaintiff's Replies due by 12/4/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-10-0511Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time and vacating the briefing schedule entered on August 14, 2018. The parties shall adhere to a briefing schedule as follows: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before October 12, 2018; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before November 16, 2018; Defendant shall file its reply and opposition on or before December 11, 2018; Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before December 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/09/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/12/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/16/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/11/2018. Replies due by 12/20/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-1212NOTICE of Lodging Classified Information by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-1213MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy (REDACTED), # 2 Combined Exhibits to Hardy Declaration)(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-11-1514Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar