Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00256
Date Filed2018-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning prepared remarks made by Secretary Ryan Zinke to the American Legislative Exchange Council. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Democracy Forward Foundation that it was being processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Democracy Forward Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5317033) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (md) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/12/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/14/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/12/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 2/9/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff