Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBarno v. Ficeto et al
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2018cv00202
Date Filed2018-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alvin W. Thompson
PlaintiffJonathan Barno
Case DescriptionJonathan Barno filed suit against the Superior Court in Connecticut alleging a variety of constitutional torts, mentioning FOIA as well. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantAnna Ficeto
DefendantRupal Shah
DefendantGerard Adelman
DefendantJose Suarez
DefendantElizabeth Bozzuto
DefendantState of Connecticut
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-021COMPLAINT against Gerard Adelman, Elizabeth Bozzuto, State of Connecticut, Anna Ficeto, Rupal Shah, Jose Suarez, filed by Jonathan Barno. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-022MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Barno. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-023Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 05/02/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2018, Discovery due by 8/4/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2018. Signed by Clerk on 02/02/2018. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-024STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 02/02/2018. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-04-095MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Anna Ficento, Rupal Shah, Gerard Adelman, Jose Suarez, Elizabeth Bozzuto and State of Connecticut by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fanelle, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-096AFFIDAVIT re 5 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Anna Ficento, Rupal Shah, Gerard Adelman, Jose Suarez, Elizabeth Bozzuto and State of Connecticut filed by Jonathan Barno. (Fanelle, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-097RESPONSE re 4 Standing Protective Order filed by Jonathan Barno. (Fanelle, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-268AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-269AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2610AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2611AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2612AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2613AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2614AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-1715AFFIDAVIT re 5 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Anna Ficento, Rupal Shah, Gerard Adelman, Jose Suarez, Elizabeth Bozzuto and State of Connecticut Signed By Jonathan Barno filed by Jonathan Barno. (Fanelle, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff