Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00262
Date Filed2018-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning memos contained in the agency's identified collection of records pertaining to former FBI Director James Comey. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5318459) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsth) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-084GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 8, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/12/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/14/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/12/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/12/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Attorney for DC), # 2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Attorney General), # 3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Department of Justice))(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-03-146NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-147ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before April 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 15, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/5/2018 (hs) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff