Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00263
Date Filed2018-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning Daniel Elwell's role on the deregulation team established by DOT. Democracy Forward Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Democracy Forward Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-051COMPLAINT against DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5318473) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/12/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/14/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/12/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 2/12/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-134Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading now is due on or before April 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/14/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responsive pleading due by 4/13/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/18/2018)
2018-04-045NOTICE of Appearance by Karianne Melissa Jones on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER. Defendant U.S. Department of Transportation's answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is now past due. Per the parties' 4 consent, and by court order, Defendant was to have filed an answer no later than April 13, 2018. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than April 27, 2018, updating the court as to the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/24/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-246Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The court grants Defendant's Motion to extend the time to answer, nunc pro tunc, to the April 13, 2018, deadline, and hereby orders Defendant to file its answer on or before May 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/24/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 5/23/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/27/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-307Joint STATUS REPORT Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before May 21, 2018, which updates the court as to whether Defendant has completed production and whether the parties can resolve any remaining issues without further litigation. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/30/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-30Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/21/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-218Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before June 20, 2018, that advises the court whether any disputes remain outstanding and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/21/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-139Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc, as to May 23, 2018. Defendant's Answer is now due on or before July 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/13/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/23/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-1910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before July 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/19/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-2312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-24MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer now is due on or before August 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar