Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. U.S. Department of Interior
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv00797
Date Filed2018-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications to or from a specific DOI officials. The Sierra Club also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated it would be put in its complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-061COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Interior ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12089696.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-062Proposed Summons. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-073Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-084Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-085Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Interior. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-146CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierra Club re 5 Summons Issued, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 1 Complaint , Standing Orders, Settlement Conference Standing Order, Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 2/14/2018) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-207CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-03-088SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Sierra Club. U.S. Department of Interior served on 2/14/2018, answer due 3/16/2018. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 3/8/2018) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-159CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Interior.. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 3/15/2018) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1510STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 3/15/2018) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1911ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 10 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-2612FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Interior. Filed bySierra Club. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 3/26/2018) Modified on 3/28/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-06-2613ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2614ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Defendant's ADR Certification and Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Scharf, James) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2715NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2716ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2717Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club or Persons and Disclosure Statement (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2718ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, July 11, 2018, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2919Defendant's Answer to 12 First Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 6/29/2018) Modified on 7/2/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-2920CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Sierra Club. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 6/29/2018) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-1121ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/11/2018 by Howard Herman. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1222Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/12/2018. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time: 17 minutes.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Ellen Richmond. Attorney for Defendant: James Scharf. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-0723STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Sierra Club. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-0924Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2018. Defendant shall produce at least 750 pages, prioritizing custodian Secretary Zinke, by September 15, 2018. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Counsel may appear by telephone and shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. (Not Reported)(Time: 10 Minutes.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Ellen Richmond. Attorney for Defendant: James Scharf. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1025NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ellen Medlin Devereux Richmond Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1326ORDER granting 25 Substitution of Counsel filed by Sierra Club. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/13/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar