Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00271
Date Filed2018-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning procedures put in place by the agency to assure that scheduled appearances by agency scientists at conferences will not be cancelled. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-061COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5320409) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons EPA, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-06Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-063LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zsth) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-204NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-03-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/15/2018. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 2/15/2018 (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-198ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Seabrook, April) Modified to add link on 3/20/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-209ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before April 19, 2018. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/20/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-2310Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by June 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/24/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-06-0411Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties must file a joint status report by June 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/5/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2018. (tg) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-0712Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by July 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/11/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-2513Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by September 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/26/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar