Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00276
Date Filed2018-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Competitive Enterprise Institute submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the Obama administration's support of the Paris agreement on climate change. CEI also requested a fee waiver for each of its requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5322108) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the Attorney General, # 3 Summons for the US Attorney, # 4 Summons for the agency, the State Department)(Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-223NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/20/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/20/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/22/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/20/2018 (Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-225Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file an answer to plaintiff's complaint or other response by March 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/23/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-296ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Seabrook, April) Modified to add link on 3/30/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-30MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/30/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-277STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-30MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must submit another status report by June 11, 2018 which provides more information concerning the number of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/30/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-06-118STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/12/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-09-149Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another joint status report by January 15, 2019, with a proposed schedule for either further production or other proceedings, as needed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/18/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar