Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGannett Co., Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv00978
Date Filed2018-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Robert W. Gettleman
PlaintiffGannett Co., Inc.
PlaintiffRobin Amer
Case DescriptionRobin Amer, an investigative journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for a copy of audiotapes concerning Operation Silver Shovel, a political corruption investigation conducted by the FBI in Chicago in the 1990s. The FBI denied Amer's request for the audiotapes on the basis of Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Gannett Co. filed an administrative appeal on behalf of Amer. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further Gannett and Amer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-071COMPLAINT filed by GANNETT CO., INC, ROBIN AMER; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14095016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-072ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ROBIN AMER, GANNETT CO., INC by Matthew Vincent Topic (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-07CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (meg, ) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-073ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ROBIN AMER, GANNETT CO., INC by Joshua Hart Burday (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-07SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (kms) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-074(CORRECTED) AMENDED complaint by GANNETT CO., INC, ROBIN AMER against GANNETT CO., INC, ROBIN AMER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-235DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Department of Justice (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-156ANSWER to amended complaint by U.S. Department of Justice(Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-167ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/16/2018: The parties are to file a joint status report by 4/11/2018. this matter is set for a hearing to report on status on 4/19/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-058MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 4/19/2018 is reset to 4/24/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-109MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties' joint status report set for filing by 4/11/2018 is reset to 4/17/2018. Mailed notice (cn) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1710STATUS Report Parties' Joint Status Report by U.S. Department of Justice (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-2411MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/24/2018. Status hearing set for 6/28/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-06-2812MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 6/28/2018. Status hearing set for 7/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0513STATUS Report Joint Status Report by U.S. Department of Justice (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-2614MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 7/26/2018 is stricken and reset to 8/22/2018 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar