Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBuffalo Field Campaign v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityMissoula
Case Number9:2018cv00031
Date Filed2018-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dana L. Christensen
PlaintiffBuffalo Field Campaign a Montana Non-Profit Corporation
Case DescriptionThe Buffalo Field Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning its "GonaCon" study, an immunocontraceptive vaccine being administered to wild bison removed from Yellowstone National Park. BFC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. BFC made several attempts to ascertain the status of its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, BFC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture
DefendantAnimal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-071COMPLAINT filed by Buffalo Field Campaign. (Attachments: # 1 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-072Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to Counsel Bechtold. (ASG) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-07Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2084979. (ASG) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-03-123ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, United States Department of Agriculture. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-04-024Proof of Service filed by Buffalo Field Campaign. Service by certified mail on February 9, 2018. (Bechtold, Timothy) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-185Order Setting: Defendant shall prepare and file a Vaughn index by 7/2/2018. Status Update or Motion due by 8/1/2018. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/18/2018. (ASG) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-266Joint MOTION for Order/Judgment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiff Buffalo Field Campaign (Bechtold, Timothy) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-017ORDER granting 6 Joint MOTION. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/1/2018. (ASG) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (ASG) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar