Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00300
Date Filed2018-02-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records prepared for the intelligence community by former UN Ambassador Samantha Powers pertaining to Russian attempts to influence the 2016 election. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5325982) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/20/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/22/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/20/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Attorney for DC), # 2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Attorney General), # 3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Department of State))(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-03-225ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sus, Nikhel) Modified to add link on 3/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/3/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/20/2018. (kh) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-196Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 6 Joint Status Report filed by the parties and the representations therein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant will issue a final response to Plaintiff's FOIA request by May 4, 2018. It is furthered ORDERED that Defendant will file any motion for summary judgment by June 20, 2018; Plaintiff will file any cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by July 20, 2018; Defendant will file its reply in support of any summary judgment motion and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by August 10, 2018; and Plaintiff will file its reply in support of any cross-motion by August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/23/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request due by 5/4/2018. Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 6/20/2018. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 7/20/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 8/10/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/31/2018. (kh) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-06-157Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment by June 27, 2018; Plaintiff shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by July 27, 2018; Defendant shall file its reply in support of any summary judgment motion and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion by August 24, 2018; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross-motion by September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/18/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-278MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brown Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-269MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-2610Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar