Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEcological Rights Foundation v. National Marine Fisheries Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv00888
Date Filed2018-02-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffEcological Rights Foundation a non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionThe Ecological Rights Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Marine Fisheries Service for records concerning the impact on the Yuba River of a proposed policy by the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 239 documents and withheld 54 documents in part under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The Ecological Rights Foundation filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Ecological Rights Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-101COMPLAINT against National Marine Fisheries Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12102318.). Filed byEcological Rights Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Linn, Patricia) (Filed on 2/10/2018) (Entered: 02/10/2018)
2018-02-102Proposed Summons. (Linn, Patricia) (Filed on 2/10/2018) (Entered: 02/10/2018)
2018-02-123Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-124Proposed Summons. (Linn, Patricia) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-125Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-126Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-237CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ecological Rights Foundation.. (Linn, Patricia) (Filed on 2/23/2018) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-268CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ecological Rights Foundation (Linn, Patricia) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff