Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCommunity Foundation of Northeast Alabama v. Anniston HMA LLC et al
DistrictNorthern District of Alabama
CityEastern
Case Number1:2018cv00198
Date Filed2018-02-05
Date Closed2018-03-29
JudgeMagistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius
PlaintiffCommunity Foundation of Northeast Alabama
Case DescriptionThe Community Foundation of Northeast Alabama filed suit to enforce an arbitration agreement with Anniston HMA. This suit was brought under the Federal Arbitration Act and is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantAnniston HMA LLC
DefendantHealth Management Associates LLC
formerly known as Health Management Associates Inc
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [9]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-051COMPLAINT against Anniston HMA LLC, Health Management Associates LLC, filed by Community Foundation of Northeast Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(MRR, ) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-052Request for service by certified mail filed by Community Foundation of Northeast Alabama. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-053NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601086535 (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-064Summons Issued as to Anniston HMA LLC, Health Management Associates LLC., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-03-195NOTICE of No Contest by Anniston HMA LLC, Health Management Associates LLC (Reeves, Virginia) Modified docket text on 3/19/2018 (MRR, ). (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-206TEXT ORDER : A telephone conference is SET for March 22, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/20/18. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 3/22/2018; attys Christopher Hopkins, Diane Maughan, Thomas Sullivan, Jennifer Clark present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-227TEXT ORDER : Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are ORDERED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) no later than March 29, 2018 . In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after March 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/22/18. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-238CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-299MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/29/18. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2910FINAL ORDER- Pursuant to the accompanying memorandum opinion, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Community Foundation of Northeast Alabama's petition for confirmation of an arbitration award (Doc 1 ) is GRANTED; The arbitration award is CONFIRMED; Costs taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/29/18. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff