Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00326
Date Filed2018-02-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for emails sent or received by former Assistant Secretary of State for European and Eurasian Affairs Victoria Nuland during a specified time period. Citizens United also requested inclusion in the news media category and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Citizens United's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5330259) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to the Attorney General, # 3 Summons to the Dept of State, # 4 Summons to US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-14Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-03-084NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-235Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's response to the complaint shall now be due by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/23/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/9/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-096ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-09MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or production by April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/9/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-207Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of 7 the parties' joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 7, 2018 proposing a further schedule for production and, if applicable, briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/24/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-078Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 23, 2018 updating the Court on the status of production and proposing a further schedule for production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/8/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-239Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stein)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of the resource constraints and production orders in other cases detailed in the Stein declaration attached to the 9 5/23/18 Joint Status Report, the Court hereby orders that the State Department process at least 300 documents per month. To reduce the number of potentially responsive documents that require processing, the Court encourages Plaintiff to narrow its request by identifying specific email senders and recipients (or other relevant key words), as it has done in other FOIA requests before this Court. It is further ordered that the parties file joint status reports every 90 days, beginning August 30, 2018. So ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/30/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court revises its prior Minute Order of May 30, 2018 to reflect that the government is to process 300 pages per month, not 300 documents. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-08-3110Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Accepting Late Filing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/4/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar