Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarter Hayes, LLC v. Federal Trade Commission
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
Case Number1:2018cv00165
Date Filed2018-02-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Leonie M. Brinkema
PlaintiffCarter Hayes, LLC a Virginia Limited Liability Company
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Carter Hayes submitted a number of FOIA requests to the Federal Trade Commission for recent records concerning alcoholic beverages. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Carter Hayes that it would need to provide $2,500 in estimated fees. The agency subsequently assessed an additional $500 in fees. The agency ultimately processed 389 pages but disclosed only 60 pages. Carter Hayes filed an administrative appeal and asked the agency to explain its fee assessment. After the agency failed to respond to the law firm's administrative appeal, Carter Hayes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees - Advance Payment, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Trade Commission
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-131COMPLAINT against Federal Trade Commission ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5944902.), filed by Carter Hayes, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-142NOTICE by Carter Hayes, LLC Notice of Submission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit I)(Carter, John) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-163Proposed Summons US, US Att., FTC by Carter Hayes, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons AG, # 2 Summons US Att., # 3 Summons FTC)(Carter, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-164Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Carter Hayes, LLC. (Carter, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-205Summons Issued as to Federal Trade Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Attorney General, # 2 Summons - US Attorney, # 3 Summons - Federal Trade Commission)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-286Subpoena(s) Returned. (Carter, John) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-287Subpoena(s) Returned. (Carter, John) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-288Subpoena(s) Returned. (Carter, John) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-289NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Charles Hayes on behalf of Carter Hayes, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel)(Hayes, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-01Notice of Correction re 6 Subpoena(s) Returned, 7 Subpoena(s) Returned, 8 Subpoena(s) Returned. An incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to file the document to the clerk's office by paper or mail. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0510SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carter Hayes, LLC. U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia served on 2/21/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0511SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carter Hayes, LLC. U.S. Attorney General of the United States served on 2/21/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0512SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carter Hayes, LLC. Federal Trade Commission served on 2/21/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff