Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00345
Date Filed2018-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case DescriptionThe Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press submitted a multi-part FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's policies for impersonating members of the news media. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and broke the request down into separate requests. The FBI told the Reporters Committee that it was placing its requests on its complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Reporters Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5333522) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons FBI Summons, # 7 Summons DOJ Summons, # 8 Summons US Attorney General Summons, # 9 Summons US Attorney Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-142NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. Case related to Case No. 1:15-cv-01392. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-153NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-154SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsth) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-165NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Anne Nelson on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Nelson, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/21/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2018. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/21/2018 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 2/21/2018 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-079NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/2018. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-0911MOTION to Consolidate Cases by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-2312NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph C. Dugan on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jason Todd Cohen (Dugan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2313ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Dugan, Joseph) Modified to add link on 3/26/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2314Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dugan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2315STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/23/2018. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-3016REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-05-0317MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Dugan, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court on or before June 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/28/2018. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
2018-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2018. (jth) (Entered: 05/28/2018)
2018-06-0118Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Dugan, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-07-2019Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Dugan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar