Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBonner v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv01315
Date Filed2018-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffRaymond Bonner
Case DescriptionRaymond Bonner, an investigative journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for specific records pertaining to the investigation of Abu Zubaydah. Bonner also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Bonner to provide a time-frame for his request. Bonner did no, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bonner filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-141COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14699996)Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-142FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schulz, David) Modified on 2/15/2018 (pne). (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-143STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-9378. Document filed by Raymond Bonner.(Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-144FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Schulz, David) Modified on 2/15/2018 (pne). (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Schulz. The party information for the following party has been modified: Central Intelligence Agency. The information for the party has been modified for the following reason: party role was entered incorrectly. (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A. Schulz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question). The following correction has been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant). (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 17-CV-9378. (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David A. Schulz to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David A. Schulz to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: the name of the defendant must be the first party name that appears in the 'To' field on the Request for Issuance of Summons; the second party name entered in the 'To' field must include care of (C/O). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-165CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-166REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-207ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (vf) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-278AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Statement of Relatedness served on Attorney General of the United States and U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York on 2/20/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-279SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. Central Intelligence Agency served on 2/21/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. Service was accepted by Hanna S., Litigation, authorized to accept service. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-28CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-09378-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-0810NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/8/2018) (mro) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-2611NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2612ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2613NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kendrick Connolly on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2914LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and parties' joint pre-conference letter addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Christopher Connolly dated March 29, 2018. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2915ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The April 6, 2018 initial pretrial conference is adjourned to May 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse. The parties' request to forgo using the Court's standard Case Management Plan is granted. No later than May 3, 2018, the parties must submit a joint proposed production schedule. Initial Conference set for 5/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/29/2018) (kgo) Modified on 5/25/2018 (kgo). (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-03-3015ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The April 6, 2018 initial pretrial conference isadjourned to May 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse. The parties' request to forgo using the Court's standard Case Management Plan is granted. No later than May 3, 2018, the parties must submit a joint proposed production schedule. Initial Conference set for 5/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/29/2018) (kgo) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-05-0216FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Hannah Bloch-Wehba to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15017141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Hannah Bloch-Wehba in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for D.C. Bar, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for State Bar of Texas, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) Modified on 5/2/2018 (jc). (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-02>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 16 MOTION for Hannah Bloch-Wehba to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15017141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas (our court does not accept state bar certificates for Texas). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0217MOTION for Hannah Bloch-Wehba to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Hannah Bloch-Wehba in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for D.C. Bar, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Texas Supreme Court, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-02>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for Hannah Bloch-Wehba to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0218LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Sarah S. Normand dated 05/02/2018 re: Joint Proposed Production Schedule. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0419ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 17 Motion for Hannah Bloch-Wehba to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/4/2018) (kgo) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0420MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 18 Letter filed by Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule for productions and monthly status updates. The May 11, 2018 conference is cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/04/2018) (ama) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-06-0121LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Sarah S. Normand dated June 1, 2018 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-07-0222STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-08-0223STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-3124STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-10-0125STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-11-0126STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-12-0327STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar