Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRivera v. United States
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv01016
Date Filed2018-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffAnthony Rivera
Case DescriptionAnthony Rivera, a former employee of the Lawrence Livermore National Laboratory, submitted four FOIA requests to the National Nuclear Security Administration for records concerning a variety of subjects pertaining to the labortatory. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rivera filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantUnited States
DefendantUnited States Department of Energy
DefendantNational Nuclear Security Administration an agency of the U.S. Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-151COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12117563.). Filed byAnthony Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-162Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-203Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-204Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-205Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-206Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-207CLERK'S NOTICE Counsel will submit a completed civil cover sheet.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-208Civil Cover Sheet by Anthony Rivera corrected . (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-209Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-2110Summons Issued as to National Nuclear Security Administration, United States Department of Energy. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-2811CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Rivera.. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 2/28/2018) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-04-0212Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byNational Nuclear Security Administration, United States Department of Energy. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0313CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Nuclear Security Administration, United States Department of Energy.. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-05-0114ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-1015NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1016JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Nuclear Security Administration, United States Department of Energy. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1017ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, May 16, 2018, at 3:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1418ORDER VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/14/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1619ADR Remark: In light of the Court's order of 5/14/2018, vacating the case management conference, the ADR Phone Conference set for 5/16/2018, is OFF CALENDAR. If appropriate, the Court may refer the matter for an ADR Phone Conference following the joint status report due to be submitted by 7/12/2018, or the parties may request an ADR Phone Conference. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-07-1220JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Nuclear Security Administration, United States Department of Energy. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1221STATUS REPORT ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Statement, Dkt. No. 20 , the Court ORDERS the parties to submit a further status report by 8/30/2018. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/12/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar