Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION et al v. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00349
Date Filed2018-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
PlaintiffFOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Democracy Forward Foundation and Food & Water Watch submitted FOIA requests to the White House Office of American Innovation for records concerning its operations and calendars for Jared Kushner, head of OAI, and others. The Office of American Innovation did not acknowledge or respond to the requests. Democracy Forward Foundation and Food & Water Watch then filed suit, arguing that the Office of American Innovation was an independent authority created within the White House and was subject to FOIA.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantWHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-151COMPLAINT against The White House Office of American Innovation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5334437) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-16Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-203ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/20/18. (DM) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-214LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-215LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/22/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION served on 2/22/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-207NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn L. Wyer on behalf of WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION (Wyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-208Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Other Response by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant requests an extension of time until May 7, 2018 to file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint because defense counsel is busy with other matters. This is the first request for an extension of this deadline, and Plaintiffs consent. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by no later than MAY 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/20/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or other response to Complaint due by 5/7/2018. (dot) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-049NOTICE of Appearance by Karianne Melissa Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-0710MOTION to Dismiss by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-07MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to Defendant's Motion by no later than MAY 21, 2018. Defendant shall file a reply by no later than MAY 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' opposition to 10 due by 5/21/2018. Defendant's Reply due by 5/29/2018. (dot) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-1511Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' 11 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs request a three-week extension on their deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion because Plaintiffs' counsel has been busy with other matters. This is the first request for an extension of this deadline, and Defendant consents. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to Defendant's Motion by no later than JUNE 11, 2018. Defendant shall file a reply by no later than JULY 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-06-0712NOTICE of Appearance by Nitin Shah on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-1113Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.. (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-0514Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-09MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 14 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant requests a two-week extension of time to file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss because Defendant's counsel is busy with other matters. This is the first request for an extension of this particular deadline, and Plaintiffs consent. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its reply by no later than JULY 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/9/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its reply by no later than 7/25/2018. (kt) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-2515REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF AMERICAN INNOVATION. (Wyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar