Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00355
Date Filed2018-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications to or from Deputy Associate Attorney General Jesse Panuccio. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5334920) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-15Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsth) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-164STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 16, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-03-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/28/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/26/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-286NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-287ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified to add link on 3/29/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-04-118Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Meet and Confer Report, that the parties file, by May 11, 2018, a further joint status report containing (1) the defendant's estimate of when the agency expects a final determination to be made, and (2) a proposed schedule for the filing of dispositive motions. See this Court's 4 Standing Order, paragraph 3(b)(ii). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 12, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/11/2018. (tg) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-139NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-05-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Department of Justice and by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by June 11, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 11, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2018. (tg) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by July 25, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2018. (tg) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-2512Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar