Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEmilio Reyes v. United States Department of the Interior et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2018cv00367
Date Filed2018-02-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John A. Houston
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes, a researcher, submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning named individuals who were descendants of the San Pasqual, Gabrielino, or Cahuilla Indians. The agency disclosed records, but withheld records under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). It also charged Reyes $300 in duplication fees for 2,100 pages. Reyes filed administrative appeals for all his requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Reyes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs
DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior, Office of the Solicicitor
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. The new case number is 3:18-cv-367-LAB-MDD. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(sjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2018: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sjm). (sjt). (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-162MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (sjm) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-233ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:17-cv-01190-JAH-RBB. The new case number is 18cv367-JAH-RBB. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/21/2018. Signed by Judge John Houston on 2/20/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff