Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00373
Date Filed2018-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE
Case DescriptionAmerican Center for Law and Justice submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning its investigation of Hillary Clinton and its decision not to pursue criminal charges. ACLJ also requested expedited processing. The FBI granted its request for expedited processing and told ACLJ that records responsive to its request were available online at The Vault, the agency's online reading room. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-191COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5337881) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FBI, # 3 Summons DOJ)(Gammill, Carly) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (jd). (Entered: 02/19/2018)
2018-02-192REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Gammill, Carly) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
2018-02-193LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE (Gammill, Carly) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/20/2018) (jd). (Entered: 02/19/2018)
2018-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-204SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-205NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail A. Southerland on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-216NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Roth on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE (Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 2/21/2018 (Gammill, Carly) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/21/2018 (Gammill, Carly) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-269RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/21/2018. (Gammill, Carly) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2610RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/21/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2018. (Gammill, Carly) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-2711Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file a responsive pleading by April 10, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/28/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-04-1012NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Olivia R. Hussey Scott (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1013ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) Modified to add link on 4/12/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1114ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 9, 2018. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/11/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-0915STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-11MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation shall continue processing the documents responsive to FBI Tracking No. 1384699-000 (FOIA Request Item Nos. 1, 5, 7). Additionally, the FBI shall process documents responsive to FBI Tracking No. 1384692-000 (FOIA Request Item No. 2) at a minimum rate of 500 pages per month beginning on June 15, 2018. The parties must file a joint status report by August 29, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/11/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-08-1616NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE. Attorney Carly F. Gammill terminated. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-2917Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-30MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by October 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/30/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-3018NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia F. Summers on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW & JUSTICE (Summers, Olivia) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-10-1519Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another joint status report by December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/16/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar