Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00374
Date Filed2018-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionAmerican Center for Law and Justice submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State, the FBI, the Department of Justice, and the Department of the Treasury for records concerning approval by the Committee on Foreign Investments in the United States of the sale of a controlling stake in Uranium One to Rosatom, a Russian corporation. ACLJ also requested expedited processing. The State Department denied ACLJ's request for expedited processing, while the Justice Department granted its request for expedited processing. All four agencies acknowledged receipt of ACLJ's requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-191COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5337883) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of State, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 5 Summons Department of Treasury, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Southerland, Abigail) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (jd). (Entered: 02/19/2018)
2018-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-203NOTICE of Appearance by Carly F. Gammill on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Gammill, Carly) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-214SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-275NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Roth on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/22/2018. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/22/2018 (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/22/2018 (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 2/22/2018 (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-2810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 2/22/2018 (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-1611RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2018. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-2612ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY.(Baer, Michael) Modified to add link on 3/27/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2813ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 11, 2018. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/28/2018. (lcapm3) (Main Document 13 replaced on 3/29/2018) (zcdw). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2018. (mac) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-1114NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1115Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent status report on or before May 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/13/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Parties' status report due by 5/11/2018 (zcdw) (Entered: 04/14/2018)
2018-05-1116Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Baer, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent status report on or before June 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/14/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-14ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Supplement to 43 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/25/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Please disregard the erroneously filed deadline for Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum. (zjd) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-1117Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Baer, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent status report on or before July 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/12/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-1118Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Baer, Michael) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a status hearing in this matter on July 20, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. In the event counsel or a party is unable to appear on the scheduled date and time due to an unresolvable scheduling conflict, counsel shall meet and confer and provide, via email, two alternative dates and times to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Mr. Jean Claude Douyon (Jean-Claude_Douyon@dcd.uscourts.gov), who shall reset the status hearing and provide notice to the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/12/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-20MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the Initial Scheduling Conference held on this date, the parties shall submit a subsequent status report on or before August 25, 2018. Defendants' counsel is instructed to advise the court in the joint status report as to whether State and Treasury will process potentially responsive records at a rate of 500 pages per month. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-20Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 7/20/2018 before Judge Amit P. Mehta: See Minute Entry previously entered today. (Court Reporter William Zaremba) (tb) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/25/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar