Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLopez v. Director of Disclosure
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2018cv00304
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alvin W. Thompson
PlaintiffElba M. Lopez
Case DescriptionElba Lopez submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's tax assessment of him. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lopez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDirector of Disclosure Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT against Director of Disclosure, filed by Elba M. Lopez.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-20Filing fee received from Elba M. Lopez: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00008928. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-202STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/20/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-213NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Elba M. Lopez, 2 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-214ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Director of Disclosure* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. *Elba M. Lopez* *1224 Pembroke Street* *Bridgeport, CT 06608* (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-285SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elba M. Lopez. Director of Disclosure served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar