Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00375
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency relationship with private prison corporations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told DFF that it had been referred to a number of different components for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5338164) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/22/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/23/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/25/2018.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-265NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-266ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified to add link on 3/27/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-28MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/28/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-04-117Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on April 27, 2018 describing the status of Defendant's searches. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/12/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/27/2018 (tj) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-268Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-159Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on June 25, 2018, and every 60 days thereafter until the government's production is complete. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule within 30 days after the government's final production. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 16, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/25/2018. (tj) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-2510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-08-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-10-2312Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-12-1713NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-2414Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 12/24/2018)
2019-02-2215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on April 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 21, 2019. (lcrc3). Modified on 3/21/2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/4/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-0417Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on April 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 4, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/18/2019 (tj) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-1818Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on May 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 18, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/17/2019. (tj) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-05-1719Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before July 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 17, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/1/2019 (tj) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-07-0120Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before July 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 1, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-1521Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report every 60 days informing the court of the status of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 15, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar