Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00376
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the Trump administration's relationship with private prison corporations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred it to various components. The Office of Information Policy told DFF that it had no responsive records. The Bureau of Prisons provided an initial response containing 17 pages. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5338316) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/28/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/30/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/28/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/28/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-305ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Cheung, Ashley) Modified to add link on 4/2/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-02MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 16, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/2/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/16/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-166Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cheung, Ashley) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that BOP will review and process for production all non-exempt records responsive to Plaintiff's narrowed requested by April 30, 2018; OIP shall complete its search for potentially responsive documents by June 25, 2018; and OLC shall complete its search for potentially responsive documents by June 18, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before July 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/17/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-177NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey B. Dubner on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION Substituting for attorney Skye L. Perryman (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/23/2018 (tj) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-07-238Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cheung, Ashley) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report and proposed schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: The Office of Legal Counsel shall produce all non-exempt, responsive records on or before August 15, 2018; the Justice Management Division shall produce non-exempt, responsive records on or before September 17, 2018 and October 17, 2018, and shall complete the production on or before November 16, 2018; the Office of Information Policy shall produce non-exempt, responsive records on or before September 21, 2018 and November 2, 2018, and shall complete the production on or before December 14, 2018; and the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before January 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 23, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 1/10/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar