Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00377
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning the July 2017 decision to cancel construction of a new FBI headquarters building. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told CREW that processing the request would not incur fees. In February 2018, GSA announced it would instead rebuild the FBI's current headquarters in Washington. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT against GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5338556) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons GSA, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-20Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/27/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON served on 2/26/2018 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-267NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-268ANSWER to 1 Complaint by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Hendry, Melanie) Modified to add link on 3/27/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/27/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/10/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-029Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Briefing Schedule by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall now file their joint proposed schedule for production and, if necessary, briefing by April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/3/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/20/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-2010Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' joint status report, the briefing schedule shall be as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by June 15, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by July 13, 2018; Defendant's combined reply and opposition shall be due by August 10, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/24/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 6/15/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/13/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/10/2018. Replies due by 8/31/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-06-1411Consent MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Hendry, Melanie) Modified text and event on 6/15/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. The following summary judgment briefing schedule shall now apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by June 29, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by July 27, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be due by August 24, 2018; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/15/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 6/29/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/27/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/24/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/7/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2712MOTION to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2813RESPONSE re 12 MOTION to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Vacate. The Court will vacate the current briefing schedule entered by Minute Order on June 15, 2018. Defendant shall process and produce the newly-located records by July 6, 2018. The parties shall then meet and confer and file a new proposed briefing schedule designed to resolve the case expeditiously by July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/28/2018. (lccrc2) Modified on 7/2/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-29***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-1314PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1315STATUS REPORT by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION; (See docket entry no. 14 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of 14 the parties' joint status report, the following briefing schedule shall apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by August 7, 2018. Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due by September 7, 2018. Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be due by October 5, 2018. Plaintiff's reply shall be due by October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/17/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/7/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/7/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/5/2018. Plaintiff's Replies due by 10/26/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-08-0616MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Travis Lewis)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-09-0717Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Statement of Facts Response, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-10-0218Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's Response shall now be due on or before October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/9/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/26/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-1719ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to Complaint by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Nebeker, William) Modified on 10/17/2018 (zjf). (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-17NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 19 Answer to Complaint was entered in error and refiled by counsel in the correct case(jf) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-2420MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-26MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response is now due on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/26/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/9/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-0821REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Travis Lewis)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-1322NOTICE of Change of Address by Anne L. Weismann (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a hearing on Defendant's 16 motion for summary judgment on Wednesday, December 12, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 27A. The parties should be particularly prepared to discuss the redactions made to the Findings and Determination document--referenced by Plaintiff in its opposition at pages 29-31 and labeled as Exhibit E in the attachments thereto--including the question of whether that document is properly considered predecisional. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/3/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-03Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2018 re 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Arguments on motion heard and taken under advisement. Opinion forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (zjd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-1723MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's Motion 16 for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/2018. (lccrc2) Modified on 12/17/2018 (lsj). (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's declaration due by 12/24/2018. Plaintiff's reply due by 1/9/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-2624MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Defendant's Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the case shall be stayed pending renewed funding. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/27/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar