Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00379
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted two FOIA requests to OMB for records concerning the possible appointment of Thomas Brunell as deputy director of the Census Bureau. PDP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied PDP's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5339363) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 OMB Summons, # 9 DOC Summons, # 10 AG Summons, # 11 US Atty Summons) (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (zsb) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-203NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-2561. (zsb) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-22Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-224SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2018. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/1/2018. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 3/1/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 2/28/2018 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-068NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-069ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-2010NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis John Lawson on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2011MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Larrabee, :Firm- Dechert LLP, :Address- 1095 Avenue of the Americas, NY,NY 10036. Phone No. - 212/698-3578. Fax No. - 212/314-0023 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5435158. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Larrabee, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2012MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicholas Passaro, :Firm- Dechert LLP, :Address- 1095 Avenue of the Americas, NY,NY 10036. Phone No. - 212/649-8755. Fax No. - 212-698-3599 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5435187. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas Passaro, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2713ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/26/18. (lsj) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2714ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/26/18. (lsj) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-1815ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn Index with supporting motions to dismiss or summary judgment by 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/18. (lsj) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-2016Consent MOTION to Vacate Summary Judgment Motion Deadline by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-0617ORDER granting 16 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/2018. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/4/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-09-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-11-0519STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar