Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMadel v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2018cv00487
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Paul A. Magnuson
PlaintiffChristopher W. Madel
Case DescriptionChristopher Madel submitted FOIA requests to the DEA for records concerning the distribution of oxycodone in Georgia. The agency told Madel that it had sent predisclosure notification letters to some distributors in Georgia. It also disclosed an Excel spreadsheet that Madel claimed could not be accessed without a password. Madel filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Madel filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Choice of format

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [33]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5968108) filed by Christopher W. Madel. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbins, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-202TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd and 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-487 (PAM/BRT). (KNK) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-203Summons Issued as to Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (KNK) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-234NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Marentette on behalf of Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-195AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-236REQUEST re 1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-237PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 6 Request. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-238ORDER on 6 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/23/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-309ANSWER to Complaint filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0410NOTICE OF RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2018 at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-2211REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Christopher W. Madel. Jointly Signed by United States Department of Justice, et al..(Robbins, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-2912PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 08/01/2018; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 08/01/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 10/01/2018; Ready For Trial by 12/01/2018. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 5/29/2018. (LLM) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-2913**TEXT ONLY ENTRY** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/29/2018. Present: Jennifer Robbins for Plaintiff; Pamela Marentette for Defendant. (ct20min) (JEP) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-2914DISCLOSURES by Christopher W. Madel.(Robbins, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-09-2115MOTION to Stay filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2116PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 15 MOTION to Stay filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice.(Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2417ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Motion to Stay 15 is GRANTED and this matter is STAYED during the pendency of the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals case numbers 18-3839 and 18-386; and 2. Defendants shall file a request to lift the stay within 14 days of the resolution of the appeals. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 9/24/2018. (LLM) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2019-06-2818LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice . (Attachments: # 1 Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals Opinion, HD Media Company, LLC, The W.P. Company, LLC v. U.S. Deapartment of Justice, et al., Nos. 18-3839/3860, # 2 Supreme Court Opinion, Food Marketing Institue v. Argus Leader Media, No. 18-481)(Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-09-2019REQUEST TO LIFT STAY by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-2020PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request to Lift Stay 19 Request. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-2421ORDER LIFTING STAY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED thatDefendants Request to Lift Stay (Docket No. 19) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 9/24/2019. (JEP) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2020-03-2322MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2323NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-04-0324NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution (Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-06-0225MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0226Declaration of Angela D. Hertel in Support of 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10)(Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0227PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice.(Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-2328MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher W. Madel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Robbins, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-3029Reply to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-0130**TEXT ONLY NOTICE** The Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, July 14, 2020 will now begin at 9:30 a.m. Only the time of this hearing has been changed. This Hearing will be heard via electronic means before The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-1331NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J.M. Pelikan on behalf of Christopher W. Madel. (Pelikan, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-1432Minute Entry for proceedings held before The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2020 re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (LLM) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-1533ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 22 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 7/15/2020. (LLM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-2134Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 7/21/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-08-0335STATUS REPORT by Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Justice. (Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-0436(Text-Only) ORDER in Response to 35 Status Report. The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint Status Report. The parties' request that the Court set a deadline of 08/17/2020 for the parties to meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. The request is Granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/4/2020.(MSK) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar