Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00388
Date Filed2018-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted six FOIA requests to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for records concerning communications between a designated CDC official and two categories of non-U.S. government officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20201
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-211COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5340571) filed by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons HHS, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-222NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-233LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW (zmd) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-04-035NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-036ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Field, Brian) Modified to add link on 4/4/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by April 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 3, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/17/2018 (tj) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-177Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by May 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 17, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/17/2018. (tj) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-168Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by June 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 16, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/18/2018 (tj) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-159Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by July 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 15, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/18/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-1810Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by August 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 18, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/17/2018 (tj) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/17/2018 (tj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by September 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 17, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/17/2018 (tj) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by October 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 17, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/9/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit another status report by October 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/17/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/31/2018 (tj) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-3114Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by November 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/31/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar