Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWithrow v. United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv00446
Date Filed2018-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William J. Martinez
PlaintiffChristopher James Withrow
DefendantUSA
TERMINATED: 03/14/2018
DefendantUSA
DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture Forest Service
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice Executive Office for Organized Crime Drug genforcement Task Forces
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency
DefendantState of Wyoming of the Attorney General Department of Criminal Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-221PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION against USA, filed by Christopher James Withrow. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope)(rvill, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-222Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-223Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Christopher James Withrow. (rvill, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-224LETTER by Plaintiff Christopher James Withrow. (rvill, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-235ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. The Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. 3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/23/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-146AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency, State of Wyoming of the Attorney General, filed by Christopher James Withrow.(angar, ) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-147Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, by Plaintiff Christopher James Withrow. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-228ORDER Granting 7 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/22/2081. (angar, ) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-179ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/17/2018. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-446-STV (angar, ) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-1710Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-1811CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court for Service of Process re 6 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, # 3 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, # 4 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, # 5 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-1812Acknowledgement of Service on behalf the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Colorado on 4/18/2018 (angar, ) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-1913NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Bart Jafek on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency (pty:dft) (Jafek, Timothy) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-2014ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/20/18, Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 5/30/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-3015Certified Mail Return Receipt 11 Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Main Document)(jgonz, ) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-3016Certified Mail Return Receipt 11 Certificate of Service (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-04-3017Certified Mail Return Receipt 11 Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Main Document)(jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-1118CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency All parties do not consent.. (Jafek, Timothy) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1419CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 18 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-00446-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1720ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/17/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-1721ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2017 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded here . SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5 /17/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-1822ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, by United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency.(Jafek, Timothy) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-06-0523Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency. (Jafek, Timothy) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-1224MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/12/2018. The court informs the parties that after reviewing the docket, it appears that Defendant State of Wyoming of the Attorney General has not been properly served. Scheduling Conference continued to 8/6/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this minute order to Mr. Withrows counselor at FCI Englewood so that Mr. Withrow can be made available to participate at thehearing. FTR: STV - C203. (morti, ) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1225CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 24 Minutes/Minute Order to Enlgewood Federal Correctional Institution, ATTN: MR. SIHPOL (Counselor) 9595 West Quincy Avenue, Littleton, CO 80123. Text Only Entry (morti, ) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1226Amended CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re 6 Amended Prisoner Complaint for Service of Process (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Marshal Service Forms) (rroge, ) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1527SUMMONS Returned Executed. State of Wyoming of the Attorney General served on 6/14/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. (angar, ) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-07-2028NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Philip Murphy Donoho on behalf of State of Wyoming of the Attorney General Attorney Philip Murphy Donoho added to party State of Wyoming of the Attorney General (pty:dft) (Donoho, Philip) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2029MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant State of Wyoming of the Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Straight v. Wyoming DOT (In re Straight)_ 248 B.R. 403)(Donoho, Philip) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2031ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: 28 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyPhilip Murphy Donoho.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (angar, ) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2330MEMORANDUM regarding 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Wyoming of the Attorney General. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/23/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2632MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the Scheduling Conference by Defendant State of Wyoming of the Attorney General. (Donoho, Philip) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-2733MEMORANDUM regarding 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Wyoming of the Attorney General. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/27/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-2734ORDER granting 32 State Defendant's Motion to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for Defendants may appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference on 8/6/2018 02:00 PM by initiating a call among all counsel participating in the conference by telephone and then calling the Court at 303.335.2365 at the scheduled time. Plaintiff may separately call the Court at the scheduled time to participate. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/27/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-3035Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Agency. (Jafek, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-3036CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 34 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, to Christopher James Withrow, #13874-091, ENGLEWOOD, FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, 9595 WEST QUINCY AVENUE, LITTLETON, CO 80123. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-0637MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/6/2018. Status Conference set for 10/22/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: STV - C203. (morti, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0638BRIEF (Verified Memorandum in Support of Discovery in FOIA Case) by Plaintiff Christopher James Withrow. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-0839Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Wyoming DCI's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and Request the Court Enter Default Against Wyoming DCI, filed by Plaintiff Christopher James Withrow. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-0940LETTER by Plaintiff Christopher James Withrow. (angar, ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar