Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00405
Date Filed2018-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning for records concerning four secretarial orders issued by Secretary Ryan Zinke. WildEarth Guardians sent the agency a letter concerning the status of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-221COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5343566) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of the Interior, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-222MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura H. King, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4852. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5343610. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-223LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-23Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-28MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Laura H. King is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/28/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-015NOTICE of Appearance by Laura H. King on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (King, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/28/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(King, Laura) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/28/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(King, Laura) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 2/27/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(King, Laura) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-299ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy) Modified to add link on 3/30/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/29/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 4/12/2018. (kh) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-16MINUTE ORDER, In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/16/2018. (lctjk1) Modified on 4/19/2018 to add docket text (jf). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-2411NOTICE of Change of Address by John R. Mellgren (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/14/2018. (lctjk1) Modified on 5/16/2018 (kh). (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by August 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/20/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2018. (kh) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar