Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNORDLICHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00403
Date Filed2018-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMARK NORDLICHT
Case DescriptionMark Nordicht submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York and the FBI's New York field office for records concerning communications between ten named individuals and any member of the New York Post, the Wall Street Journal, Bloomberg News, or Reuters during 2016. The agency denied the request because Nordicht had not provided third-party authorizations. Nordicht filed an administrative appeal and the agency agreed to search for communications pertaining to one individual. Nordicht filed a second appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Nordicht filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616089666) filed by MARK NORDLICHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-22SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-232RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/14/2018 (td) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-27MINUTE ORDER: As Plaintiff's 3 proof of service does not comply with FRCP 4(i), the Court ORDERS that such service is insufficient, and Plaintiff must file proof of proper and complete service within the time limit imposed by Rule 4(m). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/27/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-30SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-073RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/4/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/4/18. (ztd) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-144NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-075ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by June 22, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/8/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/22/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-226Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall file his Motion for Summary Judgment on or before July 13, 2018; 2) Defendant shall file its Opposition on or before August 3, 2018; and 3) Plaintiff shall file his Reply on or before August 10, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/26/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/13/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/3/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/10/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-267AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by MARK NORDLICHT; ("Leave to file GRANTED") signed 6/26/18 by Judge James E. Boasberg) (ztd) (Entered: 07/01/2018)
2018-07-058MOTION for Summary Judgment by MARK NORDLICHT (ztd) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-08-029Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar