Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePeterson v. Scoggins
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
Case Number1:2018cv00782
Date Filed2018-02-20
Date Closed2018-02-28
JudgeJudge William S. Duffey, Jr
PlaintiffAleakeem Peterson
Case DescriptionAleakeem Petersen, a state prisoner, requested information about his conviction from Melba Scroggins, Clerk of the Superior Court for Benton County, Georgia. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantMelba Scoggins Clerk of Superior Court
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-201COMPLAINT Under Freedom of Information Act, filed by Aleakeem Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 2/23/2018 (eop). (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23Submission of 1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (eop) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-282ORDER that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Rome Division for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 2/28/2018. (tcc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (tcc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28Intradistrict Transfer to Rome, new case number 4:18-cv-00047, Assigned to Judge Harold L. Murphy. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and certified copy of docket sent. (tcc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-283Transfer Letter. (tcc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Aleakeem Peterson re 2 Order, 3 Transfer Letter. (tcc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff