Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00445
Date Filed2018-02-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning contacts with White House staff pertaining to changes in agency policies. PDP also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for communications between the Executive Office of the President and the agency pertaining to Hillary Clinton. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Several components told PDP that they would not have records. PDP filed an administrative appeal of those responses. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-261COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5349175) filed by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Civil Cover Sheet, # 22 Declaration Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1)(Murphy, Allison) (Attachment 21 replaced on 2/27/2018) (jd) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-262REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Defendant DOJ, et al. re 1 Complaint,, filed by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Defendant DHS, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-263LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (jd) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-26Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-274SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-03-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/6/2018; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/7/2018 (Murphy, Allison) Modified on 3/9/2018 to correct filer information to reflect attorney of record(zrdj). (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2018. (Murphy, Allison) Modified on 3/9/2018 to correct filer information to reflect attorney of record(zrdj). (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/18. (Murphy, Allison) Modified on 3/9/2018 to correct filer information to reflect attorney of record(zrdj). (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-068NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita B. Andrapalliyal on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-069ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-09MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/09/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-2310Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-26MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 6/7/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/26/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-06-0711Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representation in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/11/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-3012Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 9/10/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/31/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-3113NOTICE of Appearance by Justin G. Florence on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-3114NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. Attorney Allison F. Murphy terminated. (Murphy, Allison) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-09-1015Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1216GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/12/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 12/6/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar