Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROGERS v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00454
Date Filed2018-02-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJON R. ROGERS
Case DescriptionJon Rogers submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning two investigations involving Rogers conducted by the IRS and the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of Ohio. The agency told Rogers that he had waived his FOIA rights as part of his settlement agreement. Rogers filed an administrative appeal, arguing that the terms of the settlement agreement had been waived. The Office of Information Policy remanded his case back to EOUSA for response. Rogers contacted the agency several times to check on the status of his request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rogers filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-261COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5349198) filed by JON R ROGERS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons to DOJ, # 4 Summons to the Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19)(Olson, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/27/2018) (jd). (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-26Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-04-163NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-164Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER granting 4 . Upon consideration of the Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 17, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/17/2018, (hs) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-155Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER granting 5 . Upon consideration of the Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 16, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 5/31/2018, (hs) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-316MOTION to Dismiss by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Hudgins Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 5/31/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-117Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by JON R. ROGERS (Olson, William) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting 7 . Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment on or before July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 11, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/13/2018. (hs) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-138Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JON R. ROGERS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank Bruzzese, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, William) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-139Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JON R. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank Bruzzese, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, William) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1710Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER granting 10 . Upon consideration of the Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 18, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 8/17/2018. Reply In Support of Cross Motion due by 8/17/2018. (hs) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar