Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00464
Date Filed2018-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of State, and the U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning communications with organizations promoting conservative values on reproductive rights and/or the Trump administration's reinstatement of the Mexico City Policy ending funding to the UN Population Fund. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Campaign for Accountability filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUS AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-271COMPLAINT against US AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5350575) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons HHS, # 9 Summons Lui, # 10 Summons Sessions, # 11 Summons State Department, # 12 Summons USAID)(Busen, Carey) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-272NOTICE of Appearance by Carey S. Busen on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-273Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (jd) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-014SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-155AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [Liu] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-156AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [Sessions] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-157AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [US Department of State] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/8/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2018.) (See Docket Entries 5 , 6 and 7 to view documents. (znmw) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-209AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [HHS] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2010AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [USAID] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2011MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nichole L. Sterling, :Firm- Baker Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10111. Phone No. - 212-589-4282. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5381916. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2012MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- A. Mackenna White, :Firm- Baker Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10111. Phone No. - 212-847-2829. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5381958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT served on 3/16/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/16/2018. (See Docket Entries 9 and 10 to view documents). (znmw) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Affidavit; emailed to cbusen@bakerlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please note correct docket entry for future reference: Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant on the Service of Process menu; Do not refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-21MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 21, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-21MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 21, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-04-0614Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 6, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/7/2018. (JK) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-05-0715ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-08MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report no later than June 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 8, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-0916ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) Modified on 5/10/2018 (td). (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-10NOTICE OF ERROR re 16 Affidavit; emailed to cbusen@bakerlaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile using the event under Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process and the select Summons Returned Executed as to... (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/7/2018 (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-2118NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Eugene Wangsgard on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Wangsgard, Kendall) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-0819Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 19, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar