Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00465
Date Filed2018-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the relationship of the agency or various officials with organizations promoting conservative values on reproductive rights. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Campaign for Accountability filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-271COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5350649) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons HHS, # 5 Summons Liu, # 6 Summons Sessions)(Busen, Carey) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-272NOTICE of Appearance by Carey S. Busen on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-273Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-014SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-015STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/1/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-156AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [Liu] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-157AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [Sessions] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2018.) (See Docket Entries 6 and 7 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-209AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [HHS] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2010MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nichole L. Sterling, :Firm- Baker Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10111. Phone No. - 212-589-4282. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5381980. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2011MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- A. Mackenna White, :Firm- Baker Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10111. Phone No. - 212-847-2829. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5382019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER: Nichole Sterling's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 10 is hereby GRANTED. Ms. Sterling may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/20/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER: A. Mackenna White's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 11 is hereby GRANTED. Ms. White may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/20/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/16/2018. (See Docket Entry 9 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-04-1613NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-1614Unopposed MOTION to Set Due Date for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and Notice Regarding Service of Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant's notice regarding service 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 5/14/2018. (kt) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-1415ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on May 30, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-2116Unopposed MOTION to Continue Reschedule Initial Scheduling Conference by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified event title on 5/22/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2117NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Eugene Wangsgard on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Wangsgard, Kendall) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion to continue 16 is hereby GRANTED. The Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for May 30, 2018, is hereby CONTINUED to June 7, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/22/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/7/2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/7/2018. Review to be completed by 6/22/2018; Rolling productions to begin 7/21/2018, and every month thereafter, at 750 pages each month; Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2018, and every 60 days thereafter. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-08-0318Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar