Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00468
Date Filed2018-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning projected expenditures for redecorating the offices of Senate-approved agency officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5351225) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-272LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-024STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/2/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/12/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 3/9/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-116Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for an Extension of Time 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/12/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 4/20/2018. (kt) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-207Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for a Further Extension of Time 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/23/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-308ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on May 30, 2018, at 11:10 a.m. in Courtroom 21, to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 11:10 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-089Consent MOTION to Continue Status Conference by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Continue 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently set for May 30, 2018 is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for June 6, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/8/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-08Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 5/30/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/6/2018, at 12:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 6/6/2018. Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-07-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before July 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/3/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-3111Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/1/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2018. (kt) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar