Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00487
Date Filed2018-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY
Case DescriptionPeople for the American Way submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development and the Department of Justice. PAW submitted a FOIA request to HUD for records concerning the removal of references to transgendered individuals in its materials about housing policies meant to provide equal access to homeless shelters. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PAW that it would take 45 days or more to process. PAW also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning its removal of references to LGBTQ youth from its materials pertaining to sex trafficking of minors. DOJ acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, PAW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5354703) filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons - U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, # 3 Summons - U.S. Department of Justice)(Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-012Corporate Disclosure Statement by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-01Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-023SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-054STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 5, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-145MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel M. Strongin, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP, :Address- 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-663-6565. Fax No. - 202-663-6363 (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5373046 PAID) Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Mr. Samuel M. Strongin, Esq., may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 14, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-04-056NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-117ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-258RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 4 Order (Joint Report in Response to this Court's Standing Order) filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-189Joint STATUS REPORT by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by June 18, 2018, a joint status report recommending a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 18, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2018. (tg) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-1810Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to this Court's Standing Order 4 by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by July 30, 2018, the third joint status report recommending a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 19, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Third Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2018. (tg) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-07-3011Joint STATUS REPORT re Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases, by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 30, 2018, a joint status report recommending a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 31, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2018. (tg) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-3012Joint STATUS REPORT in response to Court's July 31, 2018 Minute Order by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 15, 2018, a joint status report recommending a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 31, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-10-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Report, the parties to file, by November 28, 2018, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 16, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/28/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-2814Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to this Court's October 16, 2018 Minute Order by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Report in Response to This Court's October 16, 2018 Minute Order, the parties to file, by January 4, 2019, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 29, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2019-01-0315Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the defendants' 15 Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, the deadline for the parties to file a joint status report set forth in the Court's November 29, 2018 Minute Order, and ORDERING the parties to file, within two business days of Congress appropriating funds for the defendants, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 4, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-3016Joint STATUS REPORT (Joint Report in Response to the Court's January 4, 2019 Minute Order) by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Report in Response to This Court's January 4, 2019 Minute Order, the parties to file, by February 14, 2019, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 31, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2019. (tg) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-1417Joint STATUS REPORT (Joint Report in Response to the Court's January 31, 2019 Minute Order) by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Report in Response to This Court's January 31, 2019 Minute Order, the parties to file, by March 26, 2019, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 15, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-2618Joint STATUS REPORT (Joint Report in Response to the Court's February 15, 2019 Minute Order) by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Report in Response to This Court's February 15, 2019 Minute Order, the parties to file, by May 13, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 27, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2019. (tg) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-05-1319Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 5/15/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 19 Consent Motion for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the parties shall file, by May 20, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 13, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2019. (tg) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-2020Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's May 13, 2019 Minute Order by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Report in Response to This Court's May 13, 2019 Minute Order, the parties to file, by July 9, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 21, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2019. (tg) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-07-0921Joint STATUS REPORT In Response to This Court's May 21, 2019 Minute Order by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Goldblatt, Craig) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Report in Response to This Court's May 21, 2019 Minute Order, the parties to file, by August 29, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 10, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar