Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00490
Date Filed2018-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning contacts between former Associate Deputy Attorney General Bruce Ohr and Christopher Steele or any other individual at Fusion GPS. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5355109) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-012LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-024STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/2/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/09/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/9/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-04-096NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Gerardi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-097ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-10MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before May 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/10/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2018. (tg) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-138Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-16MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall now file the schedule as described in the Court's April 10, 2018 minute order before or on May 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/16/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/11/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report before or on June 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/14/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 6/11/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-1110Joint STATUS REPORT (Second) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall, before or on July 11, 2018, file a further joint status report regarding the status of Defendant's searches and proposing a production schedule. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/11/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-1211Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Third Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' joint status report shall now be due before or on July 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/12/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/18/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-1812ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT (Third) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2018 (tth). (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY : re 12 Status Report was entered in error at the request of counsel and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tth) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-1813Joint STATUS REPORT (Third) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall provide an initial response and production of responsive, non-exempt agency records on or before August 24, 2018. Thereafter, Defendant shall continue to produce responsive documents on a rolling basis every thirty days, or the next business day if the 30th day falls on a holiday or weekend. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report to the Court regarding the progress of Defendant's production no later than seven days after each rolling production. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/18/2018. (lctnm3) Modified on 7/19/2018 to edit event title (hmc). (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's initial response and production of responsive, non-exempt agency records due by 8/24/2018, and every 30 days thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar