Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOWEN v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00492
Date Filed2018-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffKEVIN L. OWEN
Case DescriptionKevin Owen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning memoranda pertaining to the delegation of authority by the Secretary. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Owen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
810 Vermont Ave NW
Washington, DC 20420
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-011COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5355171) filed by Kevin Owen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Owen, Kevin) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-01Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-022SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (2), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-283RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 3/12/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Owen, Kevin) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-294NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-115ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-126NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. Attorney Rhonda Lisa Campbell terminated. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-137NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Rhonda L. Campbell (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-05-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The parties are ORDERED to promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/30/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-138Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties' dispositive motions are due by August 10, 2018; responses to those motions are due by September 10, 2018; and replies in support of dispositive motions are due by October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/19/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2018. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2018. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-08-109MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Killens Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Killens Declaration attachments, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar