Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKriemelmeyer, Frederick v. Arde, Allen et al
DistrictWestern District of Wisconsin
CityMadison
Case Number3:2018cv00148
Date Filed2018-03-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Barbara B. Crabb
PlaintiffFrederick George Kriemelmeyer
Case DescriptionFrederick Kriemelmeyer submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the denial of his passport application. The agency did not respond and Kriemelmeyer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantAllen Arde
DefendantRex W. Tillerson
DefendantU.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-021COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Freedom of Information Act request and letter from U.S. Dept. of State, # 2 Exhibit C - Certified mail receipts, # 3 Exhibit D - Freedom of Information Act request, # 4 Cover Letter, # 5 Envelope) (jef) Clerk's office note: Exhibit A was not provided. (jef). (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-022Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-023Letter to plaintiff from Clerk's office regarding missing Exhibit A to 1 Complaint. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-024ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/2/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-02Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 34690031207. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-065Summonses Issued as to Allen Arde, Rex W. Tillerson, U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency. (jef),(ps) (Attachments: # 1 Fed. R. Civ. P 4(i) Serving the United States, Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees, # 2 Procedure for serving individuals, # 3 Wis. Stat. 801) (jef/sp). (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-266Exhibit A (USPS tracking information) to 1 Complaint, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-127Letter from plaintiff requesting revised summonses and copies. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-128Summons Reissued as to Defendants Allen Arde, U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency. Sent to plaintiff via U.S. mail. (Attachments: # 1 Summons as to U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-239Exhibit A (USPS tracking information) to 1 Complaint, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Same as dkt. 6 . (jef) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-0710Proof of Service by Plaintiff Frederick Kriemelmeyer. Rex W. Tillerson served on 3/23/2018, answer due 5/22/2018; U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency served on 4/6/2018, answer due 6/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service and Affidavit of Service as to US Dept of State, Chicago Passport Agency, # 2 Proof of Service as to Jefferson Sessions, # 3 Proof of Service and Affidavit of Service as to Scott Blader) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0711MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-0712ANSWER by Defendant U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Trillo, Antonio),(ps) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-08Set Briefing Deadlines as to 11 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 5/29/2018. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/8/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-08Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiff responsible for contacting the court at (608) 264-5153. Once plaintiff's call has been received, the court will then include counsel for defendant in the conference call. [ Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-2713** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At the June 27, 2018 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference in plaintiff's two FOIA lawsuits, both sides agreed to consolidate these lawsuits for all purposes, including a consolidated bench trial on July 22, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The court will issue a preliminary pretrial conference order that commemorates the rest of the dates leading toward trial. Also, in Case No. 18-cv-148, the court extended to July 13, 2018 plaintiff's deadline to respond to the government's motion to dismiss the personal defendants (dkt. 11 ). The government's reply is due July 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2814Pretrial Conference Order - Preliminary Pretrial Packet in Pro-Se Cases attached. Dispositive Motions due 1/18/2019. Final Pretrial Submissions due 6/17/2019. Responses due 7/1/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 04:00 PM. Counsel for defendants responsible for placing the call to the court at (608) 264-5447. Court Trial set for 7/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/28/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (jef),(ps) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference - Pro Se held on 6/27/2018 [:20] Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (nln),(ps) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-1315Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer re: (11 in 3:18-cv-00148-bbc) Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency (Attachments: # 1 Note requesting file stamped copy be returned, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1316Letter from clerk's office in response to plaintiff's request for return of file stamped copy. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-2317Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Return of Copy, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00148-bbc, 3:18-cv-00048-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2318Request for Production of Documents by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: # 1 Note from plaintiff Requesting for Return of Copy, # 2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2319Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff. Allen Arde served on 4/27/2018; U.S. Dept. of State, Chicago Passport Agency served on 4/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service on Allen Ard) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2420Letter from clerk's regarding discovery requests and request for file stamped copies. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00048-bbc, 3:18-cv-00148-bbc (elc),(ps) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar