Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00501
Date Filed2018-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the use of military personnel and equipment in parades in New York City and Washington, DC. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Public Citizen that because of unusual circumstances the agency would not be able to respond within the statutory time limit. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5358231) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Rule 7.1 Certificate)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (zsth) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-053ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) Modified on 3/6/2018 (zsth). (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-064NOTICE of Corrected Summons for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, US Attorney General and the US Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-07SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, US Attorney General and the US Attorney; (See docket entry no. 4 to view documents.) (td) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-095NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-156SUMMONS Reissued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-167GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 16, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-238Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before April 19, 2018, proposing a schedule regarding further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 26, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-059ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Walker, Johnny) Modified to add link on 4/6/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-1910Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall complete its initial searches on or before May 19, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before May 24, 2018, apprising the Court of the results of the defendant's initial searches, how long it should take the defendant to determine the number of responsive records, and a proposed schedule for further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 23, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-2411NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2412Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-29MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Department of Defense shall process the 75 pages of responsive records and make a final release to Public Citizen on or before June 29, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 13, 2018, apprising the Court of the status of the parties' dispute and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 29, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018 (hs) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-07-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report updating the Court on the status of their discussions and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary, by August 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 12, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-1314Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file either a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 20, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-0715STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar