Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00506
Date Filed2018-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning contacts between DOJ and the White House pertaining to the Disney-21st Century Fox proposed merger. PDP also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Office of Information Policy told PDP that due to unusual circumstances it could not process the request within the statutory time limit. The request also went to the Anti-Trust Division, which did not acknowledge the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5359189) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Summons to the Defendant, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General, # 6 Summons to the U.S. Attorney, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-04-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2018. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/26/2018. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/26/2016 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff