Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00517
Date Filed2018-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for any teaching materials used since January 2014 by instructors for cultural orientation classes at Resettlement Support Centers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
20 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC
Washington,, DC 20001
2022325590
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-061COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5361022) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Defendant)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/19/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/20/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff