Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJackson v. Sessions et al
DistrictEastern District of Wisconsin
CityMilwaukee
Case Number2:2018cv00346
Date Filed2018-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge David E Jones
PlaintiffChristopher L Jackson
Case DescriptionChristopher Jackson, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Attorney's Office in Milwaukee for records concerning the identity of an individual identified as a gang member and referred to as C. The agency failed to respond and Jackson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantElizabeth M Monfils
DefendantJefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-061PRISONER PRO SE COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils filed by Christopher L Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D)(kah) Modified on 4/13/2018 (kah). (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-072LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones, IFP or filing fee and Trust Account Statement be filed within 21 days. (kah)
2018-03-153CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Christopher L Jackson. (amb)
2018-03-154MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Christopher L Jackson. (amb)
2018-03-155Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher L Jackson. (amb)
2018-04-136ORDER that on or before 5/4/18 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 103.86 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 4/13/18. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, DCI)(kah)
2018-04-167REQUEST to status update of case AND REQUEST for court to hold in-camera review by Christopher L Jackson. Sent copy of docket sheet to plaintiff via US Mail. (amb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/17/2018) (kah).
2018-04-30INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $103.86, receipt number MK4689-071599. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-048SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 5/3/18 GRANTING 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, the United States Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the Complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this Order upon the defendants. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, DCI) (kah)
2018-05-079NOTICE of Change of Address as to Christopher L Jackson to Waupun Correctional Institution (REMAILED 8 Screening Order to Plaintiff and Warden, WCI and mailed copy of docket) (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kah) Modified on 5/8/2018 (kah). (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-0810TRANSMIT Summons, Complaint, Order, Consent/Refusal form to US Marshals for service upon all defendants (including Atty General & US Atty). (kah) Modified on 5/15/2018 (kah).
2018-05-0911LETTER from the Clerk to Christopher L Jackson regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: # 1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
2018-06-0412MOTION to Amend Complaint by Christopher L Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(blr) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-0413Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Compel by Christopher L Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Notice of Hearing)(blr) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-0714NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Larsen on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils. Attorney(s) appearing: Chris R. Larsen (Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-0715Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils. (Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-0716MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Elizabeth M. Monfils by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils. (Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-0717BRIEF in Support filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Elizabeth M. Monfils . (Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-0718CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils (Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-08Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
2018-06-1219RESPONSE to Motion filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Elizabeth M Monfils re 13 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request to US Dept. of Justice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Larsen, Christian)
2018-06-15NOTICE of Hearing on 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, 13 MOTION to Compel, 16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Elizabeth M. Monfils : Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 254, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Plaintiff to appear via video-conference from WCI. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(kah)
2018-06-2220MOTION for Leave to File and Plaintiffs reply to expedited non-dispositive motion by Christopher L Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Certificate of Service)(cms) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-2821Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2018 re 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, 13 MOTION to Compel, 16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Elizabeth M. Monfils , 20 MOTION for Leave to File. 12 Motion to Amend/Correct is DENIED; 13 Motion to Compel is DENIED; 16 Motion to Dismiss Party Elizabeth M Monfils is GRANTED. Jefferson Sessions is substituted in place of Ms. Monfils; 20 Motion for Leave to File is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant requests one day extension of time to answer. Court GRANTS this request. Answer is now due 7/3/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 254, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 7/19/2018. Plaintiff to appear by video conference or telephonically for this hearing. (cc: copy mailed to Plaintiff) (Tape #10:32:01-10:53:01.) (kah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2018: # 1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance) (kah).
2018-07-0322ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Larsen, Christian)
2018-07-0523FILING FEE PAID IN FULL (bx)
2018-07-1224US Marshal 285 Forms re service of Summons and Complaint as to FBI - Milwaukee Field Office, Elizabeth M Monfils, US Attorney's Office, US Attorney General, Director, FBI. (kah) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1625REPLY re 22 Answer to Complaint filed by Christopher L Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Certificate of Service)(cms)
2018-07-1726Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Joint Rule 26(f) Report)(Larsen, Christian)
2018-07-2627Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 7/26/2018. Administrative record shall be submitted to the Court, for in camera review, not later than 9/7/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2018. Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 254, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Plaintiff to appear via video-conference. (cc: via US Mail to Plaintiff) (Tape #11:03:23-11:15:49) (kah)
2018-07-2628SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 7/26/18. (Attachments: # 1 Judges Procedures and Case Management Guidance) (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(kah) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar