Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleProtect Our Defenders et al v. Veterans Affairs
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2018cv00403
Date Filed2018-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Victor A. Bolden
PlaintiffProtect Our Defenders
PlaintiffConnecticut Veterans Legal Center
Case DescriptionProtect Our Defenders and the Connecticut Veterans Legal Center submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the agency's treatment of survivors of sexual harassment, assault, and rape. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requesst and provided records responsive to part of the requests. Protect Our Defenders attempted to check the status of its requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Protect Our Defenders and Connecticut Veterans Legal Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-071COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4745391.), filed by Protect Our Defenders, Connecticut Veterans Legal Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Department of Veterans Affairs. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-072Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/7/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2018; Discovery due by 9/6/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2018.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-073ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2018.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-074STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2018.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-085NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Protective Order, 1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2018.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-086ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Aaron Paul Wenzloff* *Yale Law School* *PO Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-04-167ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Department of Veterans Affairs.(Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-168NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Nicole Elicker on behalf of Department of Veterans Affairs (Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff