Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00522
Date Filed2018-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning communications between Acting Director Mick Mulvaney and World Acceptance Corporation, a payday lender, while he headed the CFPB as well as when he served in the House of Representatives. CREW also requested a fee waiver. CFPB acknowledged receipt of the request and told CREW that it had been placed in the news media fee category and its request for a fee waiver would be held in abeyance. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-071COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5362168) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons CFPB, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/12/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 3/12/2018 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-147GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 14, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-168NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-119ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-13MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before May 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 13, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule due by 5/4/2018. (hs) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff