Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00545
Date Filed2018-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the Privacy Office of the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency's use of drones, including reports required under a 2015 Presidential Memorandum. EPIC also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5365740) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons Attorney General of the United States, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security)(Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-082Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-14Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-144NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-165GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/16/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-296NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/28/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/27/2018. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/28/2018. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/27/2018 (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-2710ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-02MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 5/16/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/02/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations made in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 6/15/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/21/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-1913MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/30/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/19/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-07-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 9/13/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/31/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar